+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3459.) (April 20).
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and GOV. & F.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor