+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- May 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 31.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2020: [First] hearing set for [05-27-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7