+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20).
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 12).
On August 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- August 4 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 3844.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13).
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Set for hearing May 13 in HEALTH pending receipt.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB852 Pan et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2020: SB 852 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
August 12, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB852 Pan
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
June 18, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2