+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3747.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
June 18, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB848 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor