+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
May 3, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB844 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor