+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 920, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6416.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3656.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3703.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: Unfinished Supp 1 SB844 Pavley Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 25, 2014: SB 844 Pavley Senate Third Reading By FONG
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB844 Pavley
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
March 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor