+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on the inactive file.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amendments by Assembly Member Valladares tabled on motion by Assembly Member Reyes.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 13 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3877.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3292.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 31.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 25, 2022: SB 843 Glazer Senate Third Reading Amend By VALLADARES Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 16
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
June 30, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB843 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 31, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor