+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4382.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5388.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On June 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3542.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2016: SB 843 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2016: Unfinished Business Sup 1 SB843 Committee On B. & F.R.(Leno) Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB843 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor