+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5750.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
- Coauthors revised.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Coauthors revised.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3579.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3254.) (March 29).
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3049.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Set for hearing March 8.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2022: SB 836 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By Kalra
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
June 1, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB836 Wiener Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 12
March 29, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1