+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS.
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor