+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate.
On August 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6755.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
- Set, second hearing.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3783.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3703.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2014: W/O REF. TO FILE SB831 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2014: SB 831 Hill Senate Third Reading By GARCIA
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB831 Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 5, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1