+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3512.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3415.) (April 18).
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 16, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 18, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor