+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5619.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 10).
On June 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3018.) (April 1).
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2927.) (March 19).
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 19.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 19, 2014: SB 827 Liu Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB827 Liu
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 19, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor