+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on third reading.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5409.)
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3740.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
June 18, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB827 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor