+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2555.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 753.) (May 1).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 15, 2013: SB 824 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
May 9, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB824 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (6)
Committee on Governance and Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor