+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 781, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6117.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 6199.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6076.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6961.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 4758.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4625.) (April 10).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 9
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB823 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2018: SB 823 Hill Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 80
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
June 21, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB823 Hill et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor