+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5903.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3998.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 18, 2016: SB 822 Roth Senate Third Reading By MATHIS
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 3, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB822 Roth
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor