+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2374.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1).
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 17 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2021: Special Consent SB821 N.R. & W. (Stern) Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 15, 2021: SB 821 N.R. & W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
July 7, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
July 1, 2021: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2021: Consent Calendar SB821 N.R. & W.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Natural Resources and Water
Type:
Primary Sponsor