+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5).
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor