+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 953, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 6471.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3).
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 24, 2018: Unfinished Business SB820 Leyva et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
August 23, 2018: SB 820 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
July 3, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
May 21, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB820 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
May 1, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1