+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On June 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
- Amendments by Assembly Member Grove tabled on motion by Assembly Member Holden. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 2058.)
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2059.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1518.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 380.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to second reading.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 19, 2015: SB 82 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2015: SB 82 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER Amend By GROVE Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By HOLDEN
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2015: SB 82 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER Amend By GROVE Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By HOLDEN
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2015: W/O REF. TO FILE SB82 Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review By Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2015: W/O REF. TO FILE SB82 Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review By Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
March 23, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB82 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor