+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2374.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On June 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.M.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 716.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 588.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
July 15, 2021: SB 817 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
July 7, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2021: Consent Calendar SB817 G.O.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Governmental Organization
Type:
Primary Sponsor