+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 3844.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3608.) (April 19).
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 16 hearing postponed by committee.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 16.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB816 Hill
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor