+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2021.
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2439.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2021: Special Consent SB813 GOV. & F.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2021: SB 813 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
July 14, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
May 13, 2021: Consent Calendar SB813 GOV. & F.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Governance and Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor