+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 26 set for second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
- April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor