+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and ED.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1