+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained.
- Stricken from file.
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2712.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and PUB. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 777.) (April 13).
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 2, 2021: SB 804 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Levine
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
July 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
June 23, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 11
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB804 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor