+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 849.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor