+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2590.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2897.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1348.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 841.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB801 Archuleta et al. By Roth Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 801 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Low
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB801
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor