+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30).
- Coauthors revised.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1086.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 332.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 12.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 11, 2019: Unfinished Business SB8 Glazer et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2019: SB 8 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Levine
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB8 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
March 12, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2