+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14).
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB794 Evans
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
January 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor