+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB794 Stern
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 24, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor