+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Reconsideration granted.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3683.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Set for hearing June 1.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referral to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 10.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O., E., U. & C., and JUD.
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 3, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 16
June 11, 2020: Consent Calendar SB794
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3