+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2758.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3098.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1160.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 3.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business SB794 Committee On HUMAN S. (McGuire) Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business SB794 Committee On HUMAN S. (McGuire) Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2015: SB 794 HUM. S. Senate Third Reading By CHU
- Yeas: 80
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB794 Committee On HUMAN S. (McGuire)
- Yeas: 40
June 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB794 Committee On HUMAN S. (McGuire)
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor