+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and TRANS.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1204.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 939.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 781.) (April 13).
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 7, 2021: Unfinished Business SB790 Stern et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 2, 2021: SB 790 Stern Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 5, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
July 1, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB790
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1