+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 893.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected May 9).
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB79 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor