+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1160.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 821.) (April 28).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB788 McGuire
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor