+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4907.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 6486.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.)
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6).
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2653.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wolk.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 990.) (May 20).
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 752.) (May 1).
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB785 Wolk Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
August 26, 2014: SB 785 Wolk Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
August 6, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
June 25, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB785 Wolk
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor