+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5436.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5387.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5905.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 9).
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 973.) (May 12).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2016: Unfinished Business SB777 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 25, 2016: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
August 18, 2016: SB 777 Lara Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 9, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
May 18, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SB777 Lara
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor