+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 5506.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5408.)
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Joint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5275.)
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (August 20).
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 5).
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3098.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 15.
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2020: SB 776 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kamlager
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 11
August 20, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 6
August 5, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB776 Skinner
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
January 15, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor