+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 550, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Stone.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2782.)
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 13).
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 6 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 885.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 688.) (April 6).
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 31, 2022: SB 774 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 31, 2022: W/O REF. TO FILE SB774 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 40
September 3, 2021: SB 774 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Stone Amend By STONE Set #1
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
April 22, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB774 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor