+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On June 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1995.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 30).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2013: SB 769 Block Senate Third Reading By QUIRK
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Block
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor