+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- January 9 hearing postponed by committee.
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 9.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor