+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- July 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 890.) (April 30).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB766 Stern
- Yeas: 38
April 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor