+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 1698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 2291.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 1087.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 883.) (May 9).
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 861.)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9 pending suspension of rules.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Heard for testimony only.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 8, 2013: Unfinished Business SB765 Block Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
July 3, 2013: SB 765 Block Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 5
June 26, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB765 Block
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 4
May 9, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor