+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died at Desk.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB764 Yee
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 6
January 14, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor