+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On September 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 2860.)
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2795.)
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 817.) (May 6).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 565.) (April 17).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2013: SB 760 Wright Senate Third Reading By PÉREZ, V.M. Amend By PÉREZ, V.M. Set #1
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 24
August 14, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 1, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB760 Wright
- Yeas: 39
May 6, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor