+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6480.)
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 27.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB76 Nielsen
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 1, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
March 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor