+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 5717.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 29).
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1159.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 11, 2016: Unfinished Business SB759 Anderson Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
August 4, 2016: SB 759 Anderson Senate Third Reading By QUIRK
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 8
June 29, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB759 Anderson
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor