+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 13).
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From special consent calendar.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 22).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB757 Berryhill
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor